Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3754 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13328 Week
» 78282 Month
» 280946 Year
» 3307799 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5548 |
03/09/1959 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31130 |
05/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
30 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
A1A-A1A |
Builder |
Brush Traction, Loughborough |
To Service |
03/09/1959 to Ipswich (32B) |
Withdrawn |
08/1997 |
Time in Service |
37 yrs, 10 mths , 28 dys |
Information |
4-digit route indicators |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
03/09/1959 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/1967 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
15/07/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/09/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
15/07/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 03/1973 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
16/07/1962 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
16/07/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/09/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5548 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Ipswich (32B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
06/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
07/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
02/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
12/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
07/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
15/07/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
10/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
29/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
07/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
11/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
03/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31130 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
26/07/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
08/1997 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31130 |
|
|