Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 391 Today
» 1270 Yesterday
» 6754 Week
» 9336 Month
» 273969 Year
» 1495534 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5549 10/09/1959  
TOPS (Tops) 31131 26/01/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/210/09/1959
31/124/09/1966
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
To Service 10/09/1959
Withdrawn 22/03/1989
Time in Service 29 yrs, 6 mths , 12 dys
Cut Up 04/1990
Cut At Vic Berry (Leicester)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
32B Ipswich (New) 10/09/1959
41A Tinsley w/e 09/10/1965
40B Immingham w/e 10/01/1970
34G Finsbury Park w/e 18/09/1971
30A Stratford w/e 09/10/1971
31B March w/e 12/02/1972
40B Immingham w/e 12/08/1972
TE Thornaby w/e 15/05/1988
   Withdrawn 22/03/1989

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Charged to Capital Charged to Revenue Total Cost
04/1969   Dual Braked      


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
10/09/1959 To Service To service as D5549
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Ipswich (32B)
   
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
04/1969 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
10/01/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
18/09/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
12/02/1972 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
12/08/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
01/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 31131    
15/05/1988 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (TE)    
22/03/1989 Withdrawn Condemned as 31131    
04/1990 Scrapped Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester    

prev prev