Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 4189 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17595 Week
» 70611 Month
» 190138 Year
» 3216991 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5550 |
24/09/1959 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31132 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
24/09/1959 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
04/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/09/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 03/1973 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/09/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5550 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Ipswich (32B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
12/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
04/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
09/01/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
07/08/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
13/11/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
12/02/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
03/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
10/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31132 |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
29/02/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
02/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
09/10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
01/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
16/06/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31132 |
|
|
11/2003 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|