Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 280 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2187 Week
» 20969 Month
» 269262 Year
» 1153643 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5550 24/09/1959
TOPS (Tops) 31132 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/224/09/1959
31/104/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 24/09/1959
Withdrawn 16/06/2000
Time in Service 40 yrs, 8 mths , 23 dys
Cut Up 11/2003
Cut At T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
32B Ipswich (New) 24/09/1959
41A Tinsley w/e 09/10/1965
40B Immingham w/e 12/02/1966
41A Tinsley 4w/e 11/07/1970
40B Immingham w/e 09/01/1971
51L Thornaby w/e 07/08/1971
30A Stratford w/e 13/11/1971
31B March w/e 12/02/1972
55B York (North) 2w/e 10/03/1973
TI Tinsley 4w/e 06/10/1973
TE Thornaby w/e 09/03/1974
IM Immingham 3w/e 10/05/1975
TI Tinsley w/e 29/02/1976
IM Immingham 3w/e 02/05/1976
BR Bristol Bath Road 3w/e 09/10/1976
   Withdrawn 16/06/2000

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
04/1968   Reclassified from 30 to 31  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
24/09/1959 To Service To service as D5550
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Ipswich (32B)
   
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
12/02/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
04/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/07/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
09/01/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
07/08/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
13/11/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
12/02/1972 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31132    
10/03/1973 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (55B)    
06/10/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (TI)    
09/03/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (TE)    
10/05/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IM)    
29/02/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (TI)    
02/05/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IM)    
09/10/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR)    
16/06/2000 Withdrawn Condemned as 31132    
11/2003 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton    

prev prev