Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 524 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2431 Week
» 21213 Month
» 269506 Year
» 1153887 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5551 10/09/1959
TOPS (Tops) 31133 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/210/09/1959
31/110/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 10/09/1959
Withdrawn 01/12/1998
Time in Service 39 yrs, 2 mths , 21 dys
Cut Up 04/1999
Cut At English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan)
Information Disc Indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
32B Ipswich (New) 10/09/1959
30A Stratford w/e 06/08/1966
32B Ipswich w/e 11/03/1967
40B Immingham w/e 11/05/1968
41A Tinsley 4w/e 11/07/1970
40B Immingham w/e 09/01/1971
31B March w/e 12/08/1972
55A Holbeck (MR) 2w/e 10/03/1973
MR March 4w/e 06/10/1973
SF Stratford 3w/e 02/05/1976
   Withdrawn 01/12/1998

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
10/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
10/09/1959 To Service To service as D5551
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Ipswich (32B)
   
06/08/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
11/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
10/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
11/07/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
09/01/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
12/08/1972 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31133    
10/03/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
06/10/1973 Allocation Reallocated to March (MR)    
02/05/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (SF)    
01/12/1998 Withdrawn Condemned as 31133    
04/1999 Scrapped Broken up by English, Welsh & Scottish Railways: Wigan    

prev prev