Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 2856 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16262 Week
» 69278 Month
» 188805 Year
» 3215658 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5552 |
17/09/1959 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31134 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
17/09/1959 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
04/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1974 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1974 |
|
Snowplough brackets removed |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/09/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 06/1974 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 03/1975 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/09/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5552 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Ipswich (32B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
03/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
12/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
04/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
08/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
12/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31134 |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
06/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
09/11/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
30/11/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets removed |
|
|
03/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
29/02/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
02/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
07/1999 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by English, Welsh & Scottish Railways: Wigan |
|
|
14/01/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31134 |
|
|