Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 418 Today
» 937 Yesterday
» 1355 Week
» 8539 Month
» 316520 Year
» 1200901 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5555 01/10/1959
TOPS (Tops) 31137 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/201/10/1959
31/105/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 01/10/1959
Withdrawn 01/12/1995
Time in Service 36 yrs , 2 mths
Cut Up 03/2001
Cut At English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan)
Information Disc Indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
32B Ipswich (New) 01/10/1959
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 17/06/1961
41A Tinsley w/e 09/10/1965
32B Ipswich w/e 11/03/1967
40B Immingham w/e 11/05/1968
41A Tinsley 4w/e 11/07/1970
40B Immingham w/e 08/05/1971
55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 07/10/1972
TE Thornaby 4w/e 06/10/1973
   Withdrawn 01/12/1995

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
05/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
15/09/1961 Not severe   Electrical overloads or arcs Electrical insulation    
20/09/1964 Not severe   Brake block sparks Oil impregnated dirt or waste    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
01/10/1959 To Service To service as D5555
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Ipswich (32B)
   
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
11/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
05/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
11/07/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
08/05/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
07/10/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31137    
06/10/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (TE)    
01/12/1995 Withdrawn Condemned as 31137    
03/2001 Scrapped Broken up by English, Welsh & Scottish Railways: Wigan    

prev prev