Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 66 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1013 Week
» 19795 Month
» 268088 Year
» 1152469 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5556 08/10/1959
TOPS (Tops) 31138 02/02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/208/10/1959
31/104/1965
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 08/10/1959
Withdrawn 02/02/1989
Time in Service 29 yrs, 3 mths , 25 dys
Cut Up 10/1989
Cut At MC Metals (Springburn)
Information Disc Indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
32B Ipswich (New) 08/10/1959
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 17/06/1961
30A Stratford w/e 10/04/1965
41A Tinsley w/e 25/02/1967
32B Ipswich w/e 12/08/1967
40B Immingham w/e 11/05/1968
41A Tinsley 4w/e 11/07/1970
40B Immingham w/e 08/05/1971
55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 07/10/1972
TE Thornaby 4w/e 06/10/1973
   Withdrawn 02/02/1989

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
08/1973   Dual Braked  

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
22/11/1963 Not severe   Train heating boiler burners Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
08/10/1959 To Service To service as D5556
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Ipswich (32B)
   
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
10/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
25/02/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
12/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
11/07/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
08/05/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
07/10/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31138    
08/1973 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
06/10/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (TE)    
02/02/1989 Withdrawn Condemned as 31138    
10/1989 Scrapped Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn    

prev prev