Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 68 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1015 Week
» 19797 Month
» 268090 Year
» 1152471 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5558 22/10/1959
TOPS (Tops) 31140 03/1974
TOPS (31/4) 31421 11/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/222/10/1959
31/102/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 22/10/1959
Withdrawn 01/03/1997
Time in Service 37 yrs, 4 mths , 7 dys
Cut Up 08/2007
Cut At EMR (Kingsbury)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
32B Ipswich (New) 22/10/1959
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 17/06/1961
41A Tinsley w/e 09/10/1965
40B Immingham w/e 05/03/1966
41A Tinsley 4w/e 11/07/1970
51L Thornaby w/e 09/10/1971
30A Stratford w/e 13/11/1971
D16 Nottingham Division w/e 05/02/1972
41A Tinsley w/e 18/03/1972
55B York (North) w/e 07/10/1972
TI Tinsley 4w/e 06/10/1973
91M To London Midland Region w/e 17/08/1974
CW Cricklewood East 2w/e 24/08/1974
91W To Western Region / GWR w/e 28/02/1976
OC Old Oak Common w/e 06/03/1976
CD Crewe Diesel w/e 15/05/1988
   Withdrawn 01/03/1997

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
02/1968   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
11/1974   Dual Braked  

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
22/10/1959 To Service To service as 31140
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Ipswich (32B)
   
22/10/1959 To Service To service as D5558
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Ipswich (32B)
   
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
05/03/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
02/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/07/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
13/11/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
05/02/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
18/03/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
07/10/1972 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (55B)    
06/10/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (TI)    
17/08/1974 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
24/08/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW)    
11/1974 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
11/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 31421    
28/02/1976 Allocation Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
06/03/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC)    
15/05/1988 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD)    
01/03/1997 Withdrawn Condemned as 31421    
08/2007 Scrapped Broken up by EMR: Kingsbury    

prev prev