Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 216 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 216 Week
» 11787 Month
» 260080 Year
» 1144461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5559 22/10/1959
TOPS (Tops) 31141 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/222/10/1959
31/104/1965
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 22/10/1959
Withdrawn 25/01/1989
Time in Service 29 yrs, 3 mths , 3 dys
Cut Up 10/1989
Cut At MC Metals (Springburn)
Information Disc Indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
32B Ipswich (New) 22/10/1959
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 17/06/1961
30A Stratford w/e 10/04/1965
40B Immingham w/e 23/04/1966
32B Ipswich w/e 12/08/1967
40B Immingham w/e 11/05/1968
41A Tinsley 4w/e 11/07/1970
51L Thornaby w/e 09/10/1971
30A Stratford w/e 13/11/1971
55B York (North) w/e 07/10/1972
TE Thornaby w/e 12/01/1974
   Withdrawn 25/01/1989

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
04/1973   Dual Braked  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
22/10/1959 To Service To service as D5559
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Ipswich (32B)
   
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
10/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
12/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
11/07/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
13/11/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
07/10/1972 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (55B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31141    
04/1973 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
12/01/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (TE)    
25/01/1989 Withdrawn Condemned as 31141    
10/1989 Scrapped Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn    

prev prev