Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 1001 Today
» 1245 Yesterday
» 7145 Week
» 38934 Month
» 187699 Year
» 1409264 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5560 29/10/1959  
TOPS (Tops) 31142 01/01/1973  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/229/10/1959
31/108/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 29/10/1959
Withdrawn 05/05/2000
Time in Service 40 yrs, 6 mths , 6 dys
Cut Up 12/2003
Cut At T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
32B Ipswich (New) 29/10/1959
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 17/06/1961
31B March w/e 11/10/1969
41A Tinsley w/e 06/05/1972
55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 07/10/1972
YK York (North) w/e 12/01/1974
HO Holbeck (MR) w/e 08/03/1975
   Withdrawn 05/05/2000

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
08/1968   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
12/1975   Dual Braked  

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
23/10/1961 Not severe   Electrical overloads or arcs Electrical insulation    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
29/10/1959 To Service To service as D5560
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Ipswich (32B)
   
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
08/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/10/1969 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
06/05/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
07/10/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31142    
12/01/1974 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
08/03/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO)    
12/1975 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
05/05/2000 Withdrawn Condemned as 31142    
12/2003 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton    

prev prev