Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 83 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17886 Week
» 70902 Month
» 190429 Year
» 3217282 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5561 |
29/10/1959 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31143 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
29/10/1959 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 04/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1967 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
01/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
09/02/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 04/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/10/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
01/1970 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
09/02/1977 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
24/11/1961 |
Severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
19/11/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/10/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5561 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Ipswich (32B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
05/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
19/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
06/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
04/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31143 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
09/02/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
04/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
12/12/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31143 |
|
|
08/1989 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|