Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 34 Online
» 2395 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15801 Week
» 68817 Month
» 188344 Year
» 3215197 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5562 |
05/11/1959 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31144 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
05/11/1959 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/03/1966 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
16/11/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1976 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/11/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
16/11/1975 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 12/1976 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/11/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5562 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Ipswich (32B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
12/03/1966 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
12/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31144 |
|
|
16/11/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|