Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 9 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2870 Week
» 21652 Month
» 269945 Year
» 1154326 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5562 05/11/1959
TOPS (Tops) 31144 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/205/11/1959
31/112/03/1966
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 05/11/1959
Information Disc Indicators
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
32B Ipswich (New) 05/11/1959
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 17/06/1961
32B Ipswich w/e 12/08/1967
40B Immingham w/e 11/05/1968
41A Tinsley 4w/e 11/07/1970
40B Immingham w/e 09/10/1971

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
12/03/1966   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
10/1975   Dual Braked  

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
05/11/1959 To Service To service as D5562
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Ipswich (32B)
   
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
12/03/1966 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
12/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
11/07/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31144    
10/1975 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    

prev prev