Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 708 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1655 Week
» 20437 Month
» 268730 Year
» 1153111 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5563 12/11/1959
TOPS (Tops) 31145 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/212/11/1959
31/103/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 12/11/1959
Withdrawn 14/01/2000
Time in Service 40 yrs, 2 mths , 2 dys
Cut Up 06/1999
Cut At English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31B March (New) 12/11/1959
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 10/02/1962
31B March w/e 11/10/1969
40B Immingham w/e 12/08/1972
   Withdrawn 14/01/2000

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
03/1968   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
03/1971   Dual Braked  

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
30/07/1964 Not severe   Brake block sparks Oil impregnated dirt or waste    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
12/11/1959 To Service To service as D5563
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to March (31B)
   
10/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
03/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/10/1969 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
03/1971 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
12/08/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31145    
06/1999 Scrapped Broken up by English, Welsh & Scottish Railways: Wigan    
14/01/2000 Withdrawn Condemned as 31145    

prev prev