Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 414 Today
» 937 Yesterday
» 1351 Week
» 8535 Month
» 316516 Year
» 1200897 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5564 12/11/1959
TOPS (Tops) 31146 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/212/11/1959
31/103/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 12/11/1959
Withdrawn 24/03/2000
Time in Service 40 yrs, 4 mths , 12 dys
Cut Up 07/2004
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31B March (New) 12/11/1959
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 10/02/1962
31B March w/e 11/10/1969
YK York (North) w/e 11/05/1974
HO Holbeck (MR) w/e 08/03/1975
   Withdrawn 24/03/2000

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
03/1968   Reclassified from 30 to 31  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
12/11/1959 To Service To service as D5564
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to March (31B)
   
10/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
03/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/10/1969 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31146    
11/05/1974 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
08/03/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO)    
24/03/2000 Withdrawn Condemned as 31146    
07/2004 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev