Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 76 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 7530 Week
» 10112 Month
» 274745 Year
» 1496310 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5565 19/11/1959  
TOPS (Tops) 31147 01/01/1973  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/219/11/1959
31/103/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
To Service 19/11/1959 to March (31B)
Cut Up 04/2001
Cut At Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Barrow Hill)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31B March (New) on 19/11/1959
34B Hornsey w/e 05/12/1959
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 02/04/1960
41A Tinsley w/e 09/10/1965
40B Immingham w/e 12/02/1966
41A Tinsley 4w/e 11/07/1970
40B Immingham w/e 09/10/1971
YK York (North) w/e 12/01/1974
TI Tinsley 3w/e 02/05/1976

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Charged to Capital Charged to Revenue Total Cost
03/1968   Reclassified from 30 to 31      
12/1974   Dual Braked      

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
13/11/1964 Not severe   Brake block sparks Oil impregnated dirt or waste    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
19/11/1959 To Service To service as D5565
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to March (31B)
   
05/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (34B)    
02/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
12/02/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
03/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/07/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31147    
12/01/1974 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
12/1974 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
02/05/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (TI)    
04/2001 Scrapped Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Barrow Hill    

prev prev