Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 177 Today
» 977 Yesterday
» 4173 Week
» 11357 Month
» 319338 Year
» 1203719 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5566 19/11/1959
TOPS (Tops) 31148 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/219/11/1959
31/105/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 19/11/1959
Withdrawn 01/07/1995
Time in Service 35 yrs, 7 mths , 12 dys
Cut Up 06/2001
Cut At Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 19/11/1959
34B Hornsey w/e 05/12/1959
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 26/03/1960
31B March w/e 11/10/1969
YK York (North) w/e 11/05/1974
TI Tinsley w/e 08/03/1975
IM Immingham 2w/e 11/10/1975
   Withdrawn 01/07/1995

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
05/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
20/12/1961 Not severe   Electrical overloads or arcs Electrical insulation    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
19/11/1959 To Service To service as D5566
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
05/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (34B)    
26/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
05/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/10/1969 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31148    
11/05/1974 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
08/03/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (TI)    
11/10/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IM)    
01/07/1995 Withdrawn Condemned as 31148    
06/2001 Scrapped Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Kingsbury    

prev prev