Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 26 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17829 Week
» 70845 Month
» 190372 Year
» 3217225 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5566 |
19/11/1959 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31148 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (31/4) |
31448 |
22/08/1984 |
|
TOPS (31/5) |
31548 |
30/04/1990 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
19/11/1959 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 11/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1967 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/11/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
20/12/1961 |
Not severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/11/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5566 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
05/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
26/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
05/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
11/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31148 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
22/08/1984 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31448 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
30/04/1990 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31548 |
|
|
01/07/1995 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31548 |
|
|
06/2001 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Kingsbury |
|
|