Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 436 Today
» 1385 Yesterday
» 1821 Week
» 8626 Month
» 115572 Year
» 1337137 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5568 m/e 01/1929

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 4575
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 01/1929
Withdrawal 4w/e Sat 09/02/1963
Scrapping During 06/1964 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 34 yrs, 1 mth , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 25/11/1953
86H Aberbeeg 4w/e 12/06/1958
88C Barry 4w/e 14/06/1958
83D Laira 4w/e 05/11/1960
82C Swindon 4w/e 09/09/1961
83D Laira 4w/e 07/10/1961
   Withdrawn 4w/e 09/02/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1929 To Service To service as GWR Number 5568
Built at Swindon Works
   
25/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
12/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Aberbeeg (86H)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
05/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
09/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
07/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
09/02/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 5568    
06/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev