Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 66 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1013 Week
» 19795 Month
» 268088 Year
» 1152469 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5569 03/12/1959
TOPS (Tops) 31151 02/02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/203/12/1959
31/103/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 03/12/1959
Withdrawn 01/10/1986
Time in Service 26 yrs, 9 mths , 28 dys
Cut Up 02/1988
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) 03/12/1959
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 02/04/1960
31B March w/e 26/11/1960
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 09/01/1965
31B March w/e 11/10/1969
SF Stratford 2w/e 10/03/1979
   Withdrawn 01/10/1986

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
03/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
03/12/1959 To Service To service as D5569
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
   
02/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
26/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
02/12/1961 Sightings Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
03/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/10/1969 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31151    
10/03/1979 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (SF)    
01/10/1986 Withdrawn Condemned as 31151    
02/1988 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev