Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 990 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 6137 Week
» 16307 Month
» 294103 Year
» 1178484 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5571 10/12/1959
TOPS (Tops) 31153 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/210/12/1959
31/108/1965
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 10/12/1959
Withdrawn 01/05/1996
Time in Service 36 yrs, 4 mths , 21 dys
Cut Up 06/2001
Cut At English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31B March (New) 10/12/1959
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 09/01/1965
30A Stratford w/e 14/08/1965
40B Immingham w/e 23/04/1966
32B Ipswich w/e 12/08/1967
40B Immingham w/e 11/05/1968
TE Thornaby w/e 06/07/1974
   Withdrawn 01/05/1996

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
05/1974   Dual Braked  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
10/12/1959 To Service To service as D5571
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to March (31B)
   
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
14/08/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
12/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31153    
05/1974 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
06/07/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (TE)    
01/05/1996 Withdrawn Condemned as 31153    
06/2001 Scrapped Broken up by English, Welsh & Scottish Railways: Wigan    

prev prev