Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 5231 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20843 Week
» 119488 Month
» 322152 Year
» 3349005 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5571 |
m/e |
02/1929 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
4575 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
253 |
To Service |
During 02/1929 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 19/10/1964 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 8 mths , 18 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1965 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1929 |
TN |
|
Taunton |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
87H |
|
Neyland |
4w/e |
24/03/1962 |
81C |
|
Southall |
4w/e |
30/11/1963 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
19/10/1964 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
87H |
Neyland |
4w/e |
24/03/1962 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
29/09/1963 |
ALLOC |
81C |
Southall |
4w/e |
30/11/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
19/10/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
07/12/1963 |
Southall MPD |
GWR5508/31/45/64/9/70/1 have arrived all ex-store at various sheds (except 5531 ex Laira in very good external condition) and are being used on e.c.s. and pilot duties instead of 0-6-0PTs. |
SLS/196401 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1929 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5571 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Taunton (TN) |
|
|
24/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neyland (87H) |
|
|
30/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southall (81C) |
|
|
19/10/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5571 |
|
|
01/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|