Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 418 Today
» 937 Yesterday
» 1355 Week
» 8539 Month
» 316520 Year
» 1200901 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5572 17/12/1959
TOPS (Tops) 31154 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/217/12/1959
31/101/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 17/12/1959
Withdrawn 31/05/2006
Time in Service 46 yrs, 5 mths , 14 dys
Cut Up 07/2006
Cut At Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31B March (New) 17/12/1959
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 09/01/1965
31B March w/e 11/10/1969
   Withdrawn 31/05/2006

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
01/1968   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
08/1974   Dual Braked  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
17/12/1959 To Service To service as D5572
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to March (31B)
   
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
01/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/10/1969 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31154    
08/1974 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
31/05/2006 Withdrawn Condemned as 31154    
07/2006 Scrapped Broken up by Ron Hull Jr.: Rotherham    

prev prev