Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4076 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17482 Week
» 70498 Month
» 190025 Year
» 3216878 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5572 |
17/12/1959 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31154 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
17/12/1959 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
01/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
30/07/1974 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 11/1978 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/12/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
30/07/1974 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 11/1978 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/12/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5572 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to March (31B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
01/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31154 |
|
|
30/07/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
11/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
31/05/2006 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31154 |
|
|
07/2006 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Ron Hull Jr.: Rotherham |
|
|