Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 417 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2863 Week
» 14568 Month
» 346057 Year
» 422644 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5572   02/1929

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class 4575
Company History GWR
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 02/1929
Withdrawal During 04/1962
Service Life 33 yrs , 2 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88F Treherbert 4w/e 03/10/1953
88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 31/10/1953
83D Laira 4w/e 22/02/1958
83E St Blazey 4w/e 08/10/1960
83D Laira 4w/e 22/04/1961
   Withdrawn m/e 04/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1929 To Service To service as GWR Number 5572
Built at Swindon Works
   
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
31/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
22/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
08/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to St Blazey (83E)    
22/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
04/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 5572    

prev prev