Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 708 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1655 Week
» 20437 Month
» 268730 Year
» 1153111 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5573 17/12/1959
TOPS (Tops) 31155 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/217/12/1959
31/125/05/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 17/12/1959
Withdrawn 26/05/2000
Time in Service 40 yrs, 5 mths , 9 dys
Cut Up 09/2004
Cut At T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31B March (New) 17/12/1959
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 09/01/1965
32B Ipswich w/e 23/10/1965
30A Stratford w/e 06/08/1966
32B Ipswich w/e 11/03/1967
40B Immingham w/e 09/03/1968
   Withdrawn 26/05/2000

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
25/05/1968   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
03/1975   Dual Braked  

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
07/11/1963 Not severe   Brake block sparks Oil impregnated dirt or waste    
09/11/1963 Not severe   Brake block sparks Oil impregnated dirt or waste    
19/04/1964 Unknown   Brake block sparks Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
17/12/1959 To Service To service as D5573
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to March (31B)
   
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
23/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
06/08/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
11/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
09/03/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
25/05/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31155    
03/1975 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
26/05/2000 Withdrawn Condemned as 31155    
09/2004 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton    

prev prev