Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 2 Today
» 954 Yesterday
» 2863 Week
» 21645 Month
» 269938 Year
» 1154319 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5575 23/12/1959
TOPS (Tops) 31157 01/01/1973
TOPS (31/4) 31424 02/1975

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/223/12/1959
31/104/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 23/12/1959
Withdrawn 01/05/1996
Time in Service 36 yrs, 4 mths , 8 dys
Cut Up 08/2006
Cut At Ron Hull Jr. (Rotherham)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
32A Norwich Thorpe (New) 23/12/1959
32B Ipswich w/e 18/02/1961
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 17/06/1961
31B March w/e 23/06/1962
32B Ipswich w/e 09/01/1965
30A Stratford w/e 06/08/1966
32B Ipswich w/e 11/03/1967
31B March w/e 11/05/1968
FP Finsbury Park w/e 09/03/1974
CW Cricklewood East w/e 09/11/1974
FP Finsbury Park 3w/e 02/05/1976
CD Crewe Diesel w/e 15/05/1988
   Withdrawn 01/05/1996

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
04/1968   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
02/1975   Dual Braked  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
23/12/1959 To Service To service as D5575
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)
   
18/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
06/08/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
11/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
04/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31157    
09/03/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP)    
09/11/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW)    
02/1975 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
02/1975 Renumbered Renumbered to 31424    
02/05/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP)    
15/05/1988 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD)    
01/05/1996 Withdrawn Condemned as 31424    
08/2006 Scrapped Broken up by Ron Hull Jr.: Rotherham    

prev prev