Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 708 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1655 Week
» 20437 Month
» 268730 Year
» 1153111 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5576 31/12/1959
TOPS (Tops) 31158 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/231/12/1959
31/113/11/1965
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 31/12/1959
Withdrawn 07/07/2000
Time in Service 40 yrs, 6 mths , 6 dys
Cut Up 07/2003
Cut At T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
32A Norwich Thorpe (New) 31/12/1959
31B March w/e 23/06/1962
32B Ipswich w/e 09/01/1965
30A Stratford w/e 19/06/1965
31B March w/e 08/10/1966
   Withdrawn 07/07/2000

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
11/1974   Dual Braked  

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
23/02/1961 Not severe   Brake block sparks Oil impregnated dirt or waste    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
31/12/1959 To Service To service as D5576
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)
   
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
08/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31158    
11/1974 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
07/07/2000 Withdrawn Condemned as 31158    
07/2003 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton    

prev prev