Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 1016 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 3115 Week
» 14686 Month
» 262979 Year
» 1147360 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5578 07/01/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31160 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/207/01/1960
31/125/05/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 07/01/1960
Withdrawn 14/01/2000
Time in Service 40 yrs , 7 dys
Cut Up 06/1999
Cut At English, Welsh & Scottish Railways (Wigan)
Information 4-digit route indicators. Delivered in Electric Blue livery.
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 07/01/1960
30A Stratford w/e 09/01/1960
31B March w/e 26/11/1960
32B Ipswich w/e 09/01/1965
40B Immingham w/e 17/07/1965
41A Tinsley w/e 06/11/1965
40B Immingham w/e 12/02/1966
34G Finsbury Park w/e 15/04/1967
32B Ipswich w/e 12/08/1967
41A Tinsley w/e 02/12/1967
31B March w/e 12/10/1968
   Withdrawn 14/01/2000

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
25/05/1968   Reclassified from 30 to 31  

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
11/12/1962 Not severe   Brake block sparks Oil impregnated dirt or waste    
01/07/1963 Not severe   Brake block sparks Oil impregnated dirt or waste    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
07/01/1960 To Service To service as D5578
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
09/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
26/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
17/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
06/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
12/02/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
15/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
12/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
02/12/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
25/05/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
12/10/1968 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31160    
06/1999 Scrapped Broken up by English, Welsh & Scottish Railways: Wigan    
14/01/2000 Withdrawn Condemned as 31160    

prev prev