Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 192 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 192 Week
» 18974 Month
» 267267 Year
» 1151648 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5579 07/01/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31161 01/01/1973
TOPS (31/4) 31400 13/05/1988

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/207/01/1960
31/125/05/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 07/01/1960
Withdrawn 01/07/1991
Time in Service 31 yrs, 5 mths , 24 dys
Cut Up 08/1993
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Information 4-digit route indicators. Delivered in Bronze Gold livery.
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 07/01/1960
31B March w/e 26/11/1960
41A Tinsley w/e 09/10/1965
40B Immingham w/e 05/03/1966
34G Finsbury Park w/e 25/03/1967
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 15/04/1967
31B March w/e 11/10/1969
CD Crewe Diesel w/e 15/05/1988
   Withdrawn 01/07/1991

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
25/05/1968   Reclassified from 30 to 31  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
07/01/1960 To Service To service as D5579
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
26/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
05/03/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
25/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
15/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
25/05/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/10/1969 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31161    
13/05/1988 Renumbered Renumbered to 31400    
15/05/1988 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD)    
01/07/1991 Withdrawn Condemned as 31400    
08/1993 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev