Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2883 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16289 Week
» 69305 Month
» 188832 Year
» 3215685 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5580 |
14/01/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31162 |
27/11/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
14/01/1960 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 08/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 10/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/1967 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
27/11/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/1981 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/01/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 30/10/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
by 05/12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
27/11/1973 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
11/1981 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
Modified Triple Valve & EQ Brakes |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
20/06/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Electrical insulation |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/01/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5580 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
12/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
11/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
27/11/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
27/11/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31162 |
|
|
11/1981 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
01/05/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31162 |
|
|