Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 1 Today
» 828 Yesterday
» 3389 Week
» 16422 Month
» 238823 Year
» 1123204 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5582 21/01/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31164 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/221/01/1960
31/102/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 21/01/1960
Cut Up 05/2000
Cut At T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
32A Norwich Thorpe (New) 21/01/1960
32B Ipswich w/e 18/02/1961
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 17/06/1961
31B March w/e 16/09/1961
40B Immingham w/e 23/04/1966
32B Ipswich w/e 12/08/1967
41A Tinsley w/e 02/12/1967
31B March w/e 12/10/1968

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
02/1968   Reclassified from 30 to 31  

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
27/06/1961 Not severe   Brake block sparks Oil impregnated dirt or waste    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
21/01/1960 To Service To service as D5582
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)
   
18/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
12/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
02/12/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
02/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
12/10/1968 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31164    
05/2000 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton    

prev prev