Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 270 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2177 Week
» 20959 Month
» 269252 Year
» 1153633 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5583 21/01/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31165 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/221/01/1960
31/126/10/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 21/01/1960
Withdrawn 21/01/2000
Time in Service 40 yrs
Cut Up 09/1998
Cut At MRJ Philips (at Crewe Works)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 21/01/1960
32B Ipswich w/e 27/08/1960
31B March w/e 26/11/1960
41A Sheffield Darnall w/e 27/04/1963
34G Finsbury Park w/e 22/06/1963
41A Sheffield Darnall w/e 20/07/1963
41f Wath w/e 05/10/1963
41A Tinsley w/e 09/10/1965
41C Wath w/e 22/01/1966
41A Tinsley w/e 18/06/1966
31B March w/e 12/10/1968
40B Immingham w/e 25/01/1969
30A Stratford w/e 03/04/1971
55B York (North) w/e 09/10/1971
41A Tinsley w/e 12/08/1972
91W To Western Region / GWR 3w/e 10/05/1975
BR Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 10/05/1975
   Withdrawn 21/01/2000

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
26/10/1968   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
11/12/1971   Dual Braked  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
21/01/1960 To Service To service as D5583
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
27/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
26/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
27/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
20/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
05/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Millhouses (41C)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
22/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Wath (41C)    
18/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
12/10/1968 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
26/10/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
25/01/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
03/04/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (55B)    
11/12/1971 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
12/08/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31165    
10/05/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR)    
10/05/1975 Allocation Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
09/1998 Scrapped Broken up by MRJ Philips: at Crewe Works    
21/01/2000 Withdrawn Condemned as 31165    

prev prev