25/01/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5584 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to March (31B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
23/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
05/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41f) |
|
|
07/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
14/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
18/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
14/08/1965 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
28/08/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
01/1966 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
25/02/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
07/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
04/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
29/07/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
15/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
22/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
03/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
12/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31166 |
|
|
06/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
11/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
19/01/1999 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31166 |
|
|
06/2009 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|