25/01/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5585 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to March (31B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
27/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
22/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
20/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
05/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41f) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
22/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
18/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
07/09/1967 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/10/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
05/12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
03/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
03/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31167 |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
06/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
29/02/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
02/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
11/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
27/09/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31167 |
|
|
03/1989 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|