Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1126 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 8586 Week
» 6099 Month
» 233983 Year
» 1455548 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5586 04/02/1960  
TOPS (Tops) 31168 01/01/1973  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/204/02/1960
31/108/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
To Service 04/02/1960
Withdrawn 20/12/1991
Time in Service 31 yrs, 10 mths , 16 dys
Cut Up 05/2001
Cut At Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) 04/02/1960
34G Finsbury Park w/e 30/04/1960
31B March w/e 28/01/1961
30A Stratford w/e 17/06/1961
31B March w/e 12/01/1963
34G Finsbury Park w/e 09/01/1965
41A Tinsley w/e 09/10/1965
91M To London Midland Region w/e 13/11/1965
41A Tinsley w/e 20/11/1965
40B Immingham w/e 05/03/1966
34G Finsbury Park w/e 06/08/1966
32B Ipswich w/e 05/11/1966
34G Finsbury Park w/e 15/04/1967
40B Immingham w/e 05/07/1969
41A Tinsley w/e 10/01/1970
34G Finsbury Park w/e 08/05/1971
40B Immingham w/e 11/11/1972
FP Finsbury Park 3w/e 02/05/1976
   Withdrawn 20/12/1991

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31B March 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 08/07/1961
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 25/10/1962
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 12/01/1963
ALLOC 34G Finsbury Park 6w/e 09/01/1965
ALLOC 41A Tinsley 5w/e 09/10/1965
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 12/03/1966
ALLOC 34G Finsbury Park 2w/e 13/08/1966
ALLOC 32B Ipswich 6w/e 19/11/1966
ALLOC 34G Finsbury Park 4w/e 29/04/1967
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 26/07/1969
ALLOC 41A Tinsley 5w/e 07/02/1970

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
08/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
30/04/1970   Dual Braked  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
04/02/1960 To Service To service as D5586
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
   
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
28/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
12/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
13/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
20/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
05/03/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
06/08/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
05/11/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
15/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
08/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
05/07/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
10/01/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
30/04/1970 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
08/05/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
11/11/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31168    
02/05/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP)    
20/12/1991 Withdrawn Condemned as 31168    
05/2001 Scrapped Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Kingsbury    

prev prev