Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 151 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 151 Week
» 18933 Month
» 267226 Year
» 1151607 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5587 04/02/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31169 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/204/02/1960
31/108/1965
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 04/02/1960
Withdrawn 01/02/1994
Time in Service 33 yrs, 11 mths , 28 dys
Cut Up 03/1994
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) 04/02/1960
34G Finsbury Park w/e 30/04/1960
41A Sheffield Darnall w/e 19/11/1960
31B March w/e 14/01/1961
30A Stratford w/e 17/06/1961
34G Finsbury Park w/e 09/01/1965
30A Stratford w/e 24/07/1965
34G Finsbury Park w/e 06/08/1966
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 11/03/1967
34G Finsbury Park w/e 25/03/1967
55B York (North) w/e 09/10/1971
MR March 4w/e 06/10/1973
   Withdrawn 01/02/1994


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
04/02/1960 To Service To service as D5587
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
   
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
19/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)    
14/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
24/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
06/08/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
11/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
25/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
21/06/1969 Sightings Hornsey depot: On shed RO 9/1969 Link
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (55B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31169    
06/10/1973 Allocation Reallocated to March (MR)    
01/02/1994 Withdrawn Condemned as 31169    
03/1994 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev