Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 174 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17977 Week
» 70993 Month
» 190520 Year
» 3217373 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5589 |
11/02/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/4) |
31401 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
11/02/1960 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
01/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
25/05/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
20/11/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/12/1971 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 02/1978 |
|
Trip cock gear removed |
|
|
|
|
12/1980 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/02/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
20/11/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
11/12/1971 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
12/1980 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/02/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5589 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Hornsey (34B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
21/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
06/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
12/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
06/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
11/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
01/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
09/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
25/05/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
24/08/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
20/11/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31401 |
|
|
02/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Trip cock gear removed |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
12/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
31/03/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31401 |
|
|
09/1988 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: at Doncaster Works |
|
|