Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 4243 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17649 Week
» 70665 Month
» 190192 Year
» 3217045 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5590 |
18/02/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31171 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
18/02/1960 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1966 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
28/09/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
28/01/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
28/01/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/02/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
28/09/1968 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
28/01/1977 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/02/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5590 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Hornsey (34B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
11/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
27/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
29/08/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
06/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
03/1966 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
28/09/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31171 |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
01/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
28/01/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
28/01/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/11/1979 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (HM) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
31/10/2003 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31171 |
|
|
12/2003 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|