Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 151 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 151 Week
» 18933 Month
» 267226 Year
» 1151607 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5590 18/02/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31171 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/218/02/1960
31/103/1966
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 18/02/1960
Withdrawn 31/10/2003
Time in Service 43 yrs, 8 mths , 13 dys
Cut Up 12/2003
Cut At T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) 18/02/1960
34G Finsbury Park w/e 30/04/1960
31B March w/e 11/02/1961
30A Stratford w/e 17/06/1961
31B March w/e 27/04/1963
41A Tinsley w/e 29/08/1964
34G Finsbury Park w/e 09/01/1965
41A Tinsley w/e 06/11/1965
34G Finsbury Park w/e 08/10/1966
GD Gateshead w/e 09/03/1974
FP Finsbury Park w/e 08/03/1975
HM Healey Mills m/e 30/11/1979
   Withdrawn 31/10/2003

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
03/1966   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
09/1968   Dual Braked  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
18/02/1960 To Service To service as D5590
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
   
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
11/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
27/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
29/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
06/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
03/1966 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
08/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
09/1968 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
29/06/1969 Sightings Finsbury Park depot: On shed RO 9/1969 Link
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31171    
09/03/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GD)    
08/03/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP)    
30/11/1979 Allocation Reallocated to Healey Mills (HM)    
31/10/2003 Withdrawn Condemned as 31171    
12/2003 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton    

prev prev