Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 68 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1015 Week
» 19797 Month
» 268090 Year
» 1152471 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5591 18/02/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31172 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/218/02/1960
31/113/11/1965
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 18/02/1960
Withdrawn 01/01/2001
Time in Service 40 yrs, 10 mths , 14 dys
Cut Up 07/2007
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) 18/02/1960
34G Finsbury Park w/e 30/04/1960
31B March w/e 04/02/1961
30A Stratford w/e 17/06/1961
30A Stratford w/e 19/01/1963
34G Finsbury Park w/e 06/08/1966
55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 09/10/1971
D10 Preston Division w/e 20/11/1971
55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 18/12/1971
55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 07/10/1972
MR March 4w/e 06/10/1973
TI Tinsley w/e 11/05/1974
91M To London Midland Region w/e 22/06/1974
CW Cricklewood East w/e 22/06/1974
   Withdrawn 01/01/2001


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
18/02/1960 To Service To service as D5591
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
   
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
04/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
19/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
06/08/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
29/06/1969 Sightings Finsbury Park depot: On shed RO 9/1969 Link
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
20/11/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Preston Division (D10)    
18/12/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
07/10/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31172    
06/10/1973 Allocation Reallocated to March (MR)    
11/05/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (TI)    
22/06/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (CW)    
22/06/1974 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
01/01/2001 Withdrawn Condemned as 31172    
07/2007 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev