Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 163 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2070 Week
» 20852 Month
» 269145 Year
» 1153526 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5592 25/02/1960
TOPS (31/4) 31402 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/225/02/1960
31/125/05/1968
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 25/02/1960
Withdrawn 20/03/1992
Time in Service 32 yrs , 24 dys
Cut Up 11/2002
Cut At T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) 25/02/1960
34G Finsbury Park w/e 30/04/1960
30A Stratford w/e 07/01/1961
31B March w/e 12/01/1963
41A Tinsley w/e 22/08/1964
34G Finsbury Park w/e 09/01/1965
40B Immingham w/e 19/06/1965
34G Finsbury Park w/e 06/08/1966
41A Tinsley w/e 09/03/1968
34G Finsbury Park w/e 10/08/1968
CD Crewe Diesel w/e 15/05/1988
   Withdrawn 20/03/1992

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
25/05/1968   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
10/1971   Dual Braked  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
25/02/1960 To Service To service as D5592
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
   
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
07/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
12/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
22/08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
06/08/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
09/03/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
25/05/1968 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
10/08/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
10/1971 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31402    
15/05/1988 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD)    
20/03/1992 Withdrawn Condemned as 31402    
11/2002 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton    

prev prev