Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 918 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 3057 Week
» 13227 Month
» 291023 Year
» 1175404 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5595 03/03/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31175 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/203/03/1960
31/105/1966
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 03/03/1960
Withdrawn 02/03/1987
Time in Service 26 yrs, 11 mths , 27 dys
Cut Up 07/1988
Cut At British Rail (at Kingmoor MPD)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) 03/03/1960
34G Finsbury Park w/e 30/04/1960
30A Stratford w/e 18/03/1961
31B March w/e 12/09/1964
34G Finsbury Park w/e 09/01/1965
40B Immingham w/e 19/06/1965
34G Finsbury Park w/e 17/07/1965
GD Gateshead w/e 09/03/1974
   Withdrawn 02/03/1987

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
05/1966   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
12/1968   Dual Braked  

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
23/03/1964 Not severe   Not known Not known    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
03/03/1960 To Service To service as D5595
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
   
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
18/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
12/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
17/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
05/1966 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
12/1968 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31175    
09/03/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GD)    
02/03/1987 Withdrawn Condemned as 31175    
07/1988 Scrapped Broken up by British Rail: at Kingmoor MPD    

prev prev