Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 280 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2187 Week
» 20969 Month
» 269262 Year
» 1153643 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5596 10/03/1960
TOPS (31/4) 31403 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/210/03/1960
31/107/1966
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 10/03/1960
Withdrawn 04/02/2000
Time in Service 39 yrs, 10 mths , 25 dys
Cut Up 06/2003
Cut At T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) 10/03/1960
34G Finsbury Park w/e 30/04/1960
30A Stratford w/e 18/03/1961
31B March w/e 12/09/1964
34G Finsbury Park w/e 09/01/1965
40B Immingham w/e 19/06/1965
34G Finsbury Park w/e 17/07/1965
55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 09/10/1971
34G Finsbury Park w/e 22/04/1972
   Withdrawn 04/02/2000

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
07/1966   Reclassified from 30 to 31  

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
25/11/1963 Not severe   Electrical overloads or arcs Electrical insulation    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
10/03/1960 To Service To service as D5596
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
   
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
18/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
12/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
17/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
07/1966 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
21/06/1969 Sightings Hornsey depot: On shed RO 9/1969 Link
29/06/1969 Sightings At Kings Cross terminus: Around the terminus RO 9/1969 Link
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
22/04/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31403    
04/02/2000 Withdrawn Condemned as 31403    
06/2003 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton    

prev prev