Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2214 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20017 Week
» 73033 Month
» 192560 Year
» 3219413 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5599 |
17/03/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31178 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
17/03/1960 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 10/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
07/1968 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
18/07/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
07/1981 |
|
Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/03/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
18/07/1968 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
07/1981 |
xbt |
Dual brakes, Steam heat, Extended Fuel Tanks |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/03/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5599 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Hornsey (34B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
25/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
22/08/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
28/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
06/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
18/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
06/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
07/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
18/07/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
10/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
01/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
24/06/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31178 |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
07/1981 |
Modification |
Modification: Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
23/06/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31178 |
|
|
10/2003 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|