Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 68 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1015 Week
» 19797 Month
» 268090 Year
» 1152471 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5602 31/03/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31181 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/231/03/1960
31/101/1966
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 31/03/1960
Withdrawn 13/03/2003
Time in Service 42 yrs, 11 mths , 10 dys
Cut Up 05/2003
Cut At T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) 31/03/1960
34G Finsbury Park w/e 30/04/1960
30A Stratford w/e 25/03/1961
34G Finsbury Park w/e 20/05/1961
40B Immingham w/e 24/08/1968
34G Finsbury Park w/e 28/12/1968
D16 Nottingham Division w/e 31/03/1973
34G Finsbury Park w/e 21/04/1973
   Withdrawn 13/03/2003

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
08/1968   Dual Braked  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
31/03/1960 To Service To service as D5602
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
   
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
25/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
20/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
08/1968 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
24/08/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
28/12/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31181    
31/03/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
21/04/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
13/03/2003 Withdrawn Condemned as 31181    
05/2003 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton    

prev prev