Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 35 Online
» 2368 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15774 Week
» 68790 Month
» 188317 Year
» 3215170 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5604 |
07/04/1960 |
|
TOPS (31/1) |
31183 |
02/02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
07/04/1960 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 06/1969 |
GSYP |
Green with half yellow panels and white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
by 08/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1966 |
|
Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
|
|
by 02/1978 |
|
Trip cock gear removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/04/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
05/09/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/04/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5604 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough Allocated to Hornsey (34B) Livery applied: Green with white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
25/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
03/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
05/1966 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31 |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with half yellow panels and white bodyside bands at base of body and middle of body. |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31183 |
|
|
02/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Trip cock gear removed |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
22/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
23/05/1988 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
23/05/1988 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
08/07/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31183 |
|
|
07/1989 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|