Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 66 Today
» 947 Yesterday
» 1013 Week
» 19795 Month
» 268088 Year
» 1152469 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5604 07/04/1960
TOPS (Tops) 31183 02/02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/207/04/1960
31/105/1966
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 07/04/1960
Withdrawn 08/07/1988
Time in Service 28 yrs, 3 mths , 1 dy
Cut Up 07/1989
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) 07/04/1960
34G Finsbury Park w/e 30/04/1960
30A Stratford w/e 25/03/1961
34G Finsbury Park w/e 03/06/1961
IM Immingham 22/05/1988
   Stored 23/05/1988
   Withdrawn 08/07/1988

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
05/1966   Reclassified from 30 to 31  

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
05/09/1963 Not severe   Electrical overloads or arcs Electrical insulation    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
07/04/1960 To Service To service as D5604
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
   
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
25/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
03/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
05/1966 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31183    
22/05/1988 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IM)    
23/05/1988 Allocation      
23/05/1988 To Store To Store    
08/07/1988 Withdrawn Condemned as 31183    
07/1989 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev