Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 1025 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 3124 Week
» 14695 Month
» 262988 Year
» 1147369 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5605 07/04/1960
TOPS (31/4) 31404 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/207/04/1960
31/104/1966
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
Cost when Built £
To Service 07/04/1960
Withdrawn 21/02/1991
Time in Service 30 yrs, 10 mths , 14 dys
Cut Up 03/1994
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) 07/04/1960
34G Finsbury Park w/e 30/04/1960
30A Stratford w/e 07/01/1961
34G Finsbury Park w/e 03/06/1961
CD Crewe Diesel w/e 15/05/1988
   Withdrawn 21/02/1991

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
04/1966   Reclassified from 30 to 31  
11/1968   Dual Braked  

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
15/02/1964 Not severe   Brake block sparks Oil impregnated dirt or waste    
18/07/1964 Not severe   Brake block sparks Electrical insulation    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
07/04/1960 To Service To service as D5605
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
   
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
07/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
26/02/1961 Sightings Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Outside erecting shop.   Link
03/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
04/1966 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/1968 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
21/06/1969 Sightings Hornsey depot: On shed RO 9/1969 Link
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31404    
15/05/1988 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD)    
21/02/1991 Withdrawn Condemned as 31404    
03/1994 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev